Eatman et. al. v. County of Suffolk et. al.
Plaintiff: Dana Eatman, Jaedyn Parler and J. M.
Defendant: County of Suffolk and John Doe 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv07050
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, to move for dismissal pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by County of Suffolk. (Skorupa, Stacy)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the ATTteleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to County of Suffolk. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 13, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 13, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Dana Eatman, J. M., Jaedyn Parler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (DePaola, Samuel)
December 22, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Suffolk, John Doe 1-10 filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15137098 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Dana Eatman, J. M., Jaedyn Parler. (DePaola, Samuel) Modified on 1/13/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eatman et. al. v. County of Suffolk et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Eatman
Represented By: Samuel Christopher DePaola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaedyn Parler
Represented By: Samuel Christopher DePaola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. M.
Represented By: Samuel Christopher DePaola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Suffolk
Represented By: Stacy Ann Skorupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?