Chimelis v. County of Suffolk et al
Plaintiff: Anne Chimelis
Defendant: County of Suffolk, Suffolk County Police Department, Police Officer Peter Alvarez, Police Officer "John" Ianonne and Police Officers John and Jane Does 1-4
Case Number: 2:2021cv07079
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference via Zoom will be held at 11:30 am on 3/23/2022 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 3/16/2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order, #2 JMW Individual Rules)(Ortiz, Grisel)
January 24, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Peter Alvarez, County of Suffolk, "John" Ianonne. (Skorupa, Stacy)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Chimelis. Peter Alvarez served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; County of Suffolk served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; "John" Ianonne served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Suffolk County Police Department served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Suffolk County Police Department, #2 Affidavit of Service P.O. Peter Alvarez, #3 Affidavit of Service P.O. "John" Ianonne) (Brewington, Frederick)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Landow, Concetta)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
December 27, 2021 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
December 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Alvarez, County of Suffolk, "John" Ianonne, John and Jane Does 1-4, Suffolk County Police Department filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15139668 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Anne Chimelis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Brewington, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chimelis v. County of Suffolk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Chimelis
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Suffolk
Represented By: Stacy Ann Skorupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Peter Alvarez
Represented By: Stacy Ann Skorupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer "John" Ianonne
Represented By: Stacy Ann Skorupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officers John and Jane Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?