Markel American Insurance Company v. Sam Maintenance Service, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Defendant: Sam Maintenance Service, Inc., Deegan 135 Realty, LLC, Chess Builders, LLC, Maria Lopez, Linda Bustamante Quintana and Deegan 135 Realty LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00021
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Craig Kaufman, Jr on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Kaufman, Thomas)
February 25, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markel American Insurance Company. Maria Lopez served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Villaverde, April)
February 25, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markel American Insurance Company. Linda Bustamante Quintana served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/21/2022. (Villaverde, April)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting consent #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Chess Builders, LLC and Deegan 135 Realty LLC. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/9/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/17/2022. (Quinlan, Krista)
February 16, 2022 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Chess Builders, LLC, Deegan 135 Realty LLC. (Pavloff, Sherri)
February 16, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chess Builders, LLC, Deegan 135 Realty LLC (Pavloff, Sherri)
February 16, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherri N. Pavloff on behalf of Chess Builders, LLC, Deegan 135 Realty LLC (aty to be noticed) (Pavloff, Sherri)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Markel American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel American Insurance Company. (Villaverde, April)
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markel American Insurance Company. Sam Maintenance Service, Inc. served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Villaverde, April)(Modified.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markel American Insurance Company. Chess Builders, LLC served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Villaverde, April) (Modified.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markel American Insurance Company. Deegan 135 Realty LLC served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Villaverde, April) (Modified.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
January 27, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Linda Bustamante Quintana. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,, by Markel American Insurance Company (Villaverde, April)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 5/3/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 4/19/2022. In addition to appearing parties' submission of the CMP as directed herein, in the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/18/2022. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Gary R. Brown, Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/14/2022. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion to Reassign Case. Based upon the information supplied by counsel, the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to a United States District Judge in Brooklyn consistent with the division of business rules of this Court. See Silverberg v. Dryships Inc., 2021 WL 2198701 (E.D.N.Y. May 28, 2021). Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/13/2022. c/ecf (Cowan, Timothy)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION to Reassign Case by random selection to a Judge in Brooklyn by Markel American Insurance Company. (Villaverde, April)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Maria Lopez. (Tirado, Chelsea)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,, by Markel American Insurance Company (Villaverde, April)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Following review of the complaint herein, and in light of this Court's decision in Silverberg v. Dryships Inc., 2021 WL 2198701 (E.D.N.Y. May 28, 2021), plaintiff's counsel is to file a letter by close of business on January 13, 2022 stating with specificity counsel's basis for representing on the cover sheet of this action that it arose in Nassau or Suffolk Counties, or whether the matter should be reassigned via random selection to a judge in Brooklyn. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/6/2022. c/ecf (Cowan, Timothy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chess Builders, LLC, Deegan 135 Realty LLC, Linda Bustamante Quintana, Sam Maintenance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Deegan 135 Realty LLC, #2 Summons-Chess Builders, LLC, #3 Summons-Linda Bustamante Qunitana) (Flanagan, Doreen) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/5/2022) (Flanagan, Doreen).
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 5, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Neptune, Pierre) Modified on 1/5/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2022: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15158577 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Markel American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MAIC Policy, #2 Exhibit Quintana Action Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Quintana Action Third-Party Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Quintana Action Second Third-Party Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit Quintana Action Third Third-Party Summons and Complaint, #6 Exhibit Email dated 2/19/20, #7 Exhibit Lopez Action Summons and Complaint, #8 Exhibit Lopez Action Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Email dated 3/18/21, #10 Exhibit Email dated 6/23/21, #11 Exhibit Emailed dated 6/30/21, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons Sam Maintenance Service, #14 Proposed Summons Deegan 135 Realty LLC, #15 Proposed Summons Chess Builders, LLC, #16 Proposed Summons Linda Bustamante Quintana) (Villaverde, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v. Sam Maintenance Service, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: April Theresa Villaverde
Represented By: Thomas Craig Kaufman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Maintenance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deegan 135 Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chess Builders, LLC
Represented By: Sherri N. Pavloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Bustamante Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deegan 135 Realty LLC
Represented By: Sherri N. Pavloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?