Narragansett Bay Insurance Company v. Greene et. al.
Plaintiff: Narragansett Bay Insurance Co. and Narragansett Bay Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael Greene, Aaron Ferretti, Keisha Gilbert and C. K.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00071
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Greene, filed by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Underlying Ferretti Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit Underlying CK Lawsuit) (Cosgrove, Robert)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: A Tele-Initial Conference is set for 3/23/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 SIL Individual Rules, #2 Scheduling Order Worksheet) (Gandiosi, Kristin) (A copy of the order and the attachments have been mailed to pro se plaintiff on 2/16/2022 by Chambers.)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company. C. K. served on 1/15/2022, answer due 2/5/2022. (Cosgrove, Robert)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael Greene. (Valle, Christine)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 Letter to Pro Se Litigant from Pro Se Office dated 2/2/2022 Re: Enclosed answer is being returned without docketing or consideration for the following reason(s) set forth herein. (Valle, Christine)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (Cosgrove, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (Cosgrove, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (Cosgrove, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company (Cosgrove, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 7, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 7, 2022 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Added missing Defendant C.K. to the case. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summons and Exhibits) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 7, 2022 Your Proposed Summons was not issued for the following reason: The form of Proposed Summons is incorrect. Please use the correct Summons Form AO 440 Rev 6/12, SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION. Please correct the Proposed Summons and resubmit the Proposed Summons using the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/6/2022) (Bowens, Priscilla). Modified on 1/7/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Narragansett Bay Insurance Company. (Cosgrove, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen).
January 6, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: Did not use the correct Summons form AO 440 Rev 6/12, SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION or AO 441 Rev 7/10, SUMMONS ON A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-15167003 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Narragansett Bay Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Cosgrove, Robert)
January 5, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page must be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narragansett Bay Insurance Company v. Greene et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narragansett Bay Insurance Co.
Represented By: Robert James Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narragansett Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert James Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Ferretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keisha Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?