Dugan v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Dugan
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Group Incorporated and Cook Group Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv00452
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 189): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the order of October 15, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. (Florio, Lisa)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 189): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the order of October 15, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. (Florio, Lisa)
February 7, 2022 Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
February 7, 2022 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:22-cv-06720, filed 02/07/2022. (Florio, Lisa)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the ATTteleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2) (Landow, Concetta)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15229892 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Kristen Dugan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Cook Incorporated, #2 Proposed Summons Cook Medical LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Cook Group Incorporated, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Solomon, Andrew)
January 26, 2022 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta)
January 26, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugan v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Dugan
Represented By: Andrew Todd Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?