Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Alicia Brown
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01763
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Alicia Brown. (Brown, William)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for June 2nd before the undersigned will instead be held at 10:00 a.m. on June 14, 2022. Counsel shall use the same dial-in information previously provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/12/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held before the undersigned at 1:00 p.m. on June 2, 2022 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed by May 31, 2022. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/3/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caminiti, Kathleen)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caminiti, Kathleen)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Blair on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Blair, Amanda)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 4/26/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/4/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
March 30, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2022: #1 Additional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta).
March 30, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Caminiti, Kathleen)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Supreme Court of State of NY, Nassau County, case number 600090/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15420541) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Service) (Caminiti, Kathleen) Modified on 3/30/2022 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Brown
Represented By: William M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kathleen McLeod Caminiti
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?