Landa v. American Prospect, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Landa
Defendant: American Prospect, Inc., Maureen Tkacik and David Dayen
Case Number: 2:2022cv01825
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay discovery and proposed briefing schedule for motion to dismiss by American Prospect, Inc., David Dayen, Maureen Tkacik. (Sullivan, Thomas)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Civil Cause for PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (Tel) held on 5/16/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff: John Morrissy. Counsel for Defendants: Thomas Sullivan. Case called. Counsel present for all sides. Other: The parties shall inform the Court on or before May 30, 2022 on how they wish to proceed including any proposed next steps and/or, if applicable, a joint proposed briefing schedule for Defendant's proposed motion. (Coleman, Laurie)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by June 10, 2022. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) form) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A telephone Pre-Motion conference is set for 5/16/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack. Counsel shall dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 4785432 at the prompt. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/5/2022. (Posillico, Lauren)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 Letter in response to Defendants' April 8, 2022 letter regarding intended motion to dismiss by Benjamin Landa (Morrissy, John)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 Letter Regarding Intended Motion to Dismiss by American Prospect, Inc., David Dayen, Maureen Tkacik (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SentosaCare decision) (Sullivan, Thomas) Modified on 4/11/2022 to change event type to motion (Coleman, Laurie).
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Morrissy on behalf of Benjamin Landa (notification declined or already on case) (Morrissy, John)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Prospect, Inc., David Dayen, Maureen Tkacik from NY Supreme Court, County of Nassau, case number 602168/2022. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15431061) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Ex. B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Sullivan, Thomas) Modified on 4/1/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
April 1, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landa v. American Prospect, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Landa
Represented By: John David Morrissy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Prospect, Inc.
Represented By: Alia Lyerly Smith
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Tkacik
Represented By: Alia Lyerly Smith
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dayen
Represented By: Alia Lyerly Smith
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?