IOU Central, Inc. v. Gabriel's Collision Norman Ave, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IOU Central Inc. and IOU Central, Inc. doing business as IOU Financial, Inc
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Norman Ave. Inc., Gabriel's Collision Long Island City,Inc., Gabriel's Collision Center Inc., Gabriel's Collision Van Damme, Inc., Gabriel Fabian Bravo, Lisa F. Bravo, Christian Bravo, Gabriel's Collision Norman Ave, Inc., Gabriel's Collision Long Island City, Inc., Gabriel's Collision Center, Inc. and Lisa Commisso-Bravo
Case Number: 2:2022cv02030
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, by IOU Central, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Gabriel's Long Island, #2 Proposed Summons Gabriel's Collision Center, #3 Proposed Summons Gabriel's Van Damme, #4 Proposed Summons Gabriel Bravo, #5 Proposed Summons Lisa Bravo, #6 Proposed Summons Christian Bravo) (Wersant, Paul)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
April 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
April 12, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reason: The caption on each summons does not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Jakubowski, Laura)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2022: #1 Additional Corrections) (Jakubowski, Laura).
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by IOU Central Inc. (Wersant, Paul)
April 11, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IOU Central Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IOU CENTRAL INC - Canada for IOU Central Inc.. (Wersant, Paul)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Plaintiff Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15457728. by IOU Central Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 2: GA Letter of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3: FL Letter Good Standing, #4 Exhibit 4: D.C. Cert of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit 5: Proposed Order) (Wersant, Paul)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by IOU Central Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Gabriel's Collision Long Island, #2 Proposed Summons Gabriel's Collision Center, #3 Proposed Summons Gabriel's Van Damme, #4 Proposed Summons Gabriel F. Bravo, #5 Proposed Summons Lisa Bravo, #6 Proposed Summons Christian Bravo) (Wersant, Paul)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by IOU Central Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wersant, Paul)
April 8, 2022 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15457494 (Wersant, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IOU Central, Inc. v. Gabriel's Collision Norman Ave, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOU Central Inc.
Represented By: Paul Gerard Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOU Central, Inc. doing business as IOU Financial, Inc
Represented By: Paul Gerard Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Norman Ave. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Long Island City,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Center Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Van Damme, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Fabian Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa F. Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Norman Ave, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Long Island City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel's Collision Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Commisso-Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?