Krasnicki v. SCO Family of Services et. al.
Plaintiff: Michael Krasnicki
Defendant: SCO Family of Services and Madonna Heights Services
Case Number: 2:2022cv02563
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Diane Gujarati
2 Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Shields, Ana)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Madonna Heights Services, SCO Family of Services (Shields, Ana)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Notwithstanding the reassignment of this case to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst, the initial conference scheduled for 9/14/2022 at 11:00 a.m. will proceed at that time via the AT&T Teleconference center; parties should dial 1-877-402-9753 and enter access code 2785175# at the prompt. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 6/21/2022. (Baron, Corey)
June 10, 2022 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Due to a scheduling error, the Court hereby reschedules the initial conference in this matterto 9/14/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. The parties are directed to call the AT&T Teleconferencing Center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS RULES, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/14/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the ATTteleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Joint Letter Requirements, #3 Employment Protocols) (Torres, Jasmine)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Scott Baskin on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Baskin, Isaac)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Shields on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Shields, Ana)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Shields on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Shields, Ana)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Krasnicki. Madonna Heights Services waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/4/2022; SCO Family of Services waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/4/2022. (Weiss, Adam)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Madonna Heights Services, SCO Family of Services. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Michael Krasnicki (Weiss, Adam)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Michael Krasnicki (Weiss, Adam)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15536551 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Michael Krasnicki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter) (Weiss, Adam) Modified on 5/5/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen).
May 5, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasnicki v. SCO Family of Services et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Krasnicki
Represented By: Adam C. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCO Family of Services
Represented By: Ana Shields
Represented By: Isaac Scott Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madonna Heights Services
Represented By: Ana Shields
Represented By: Isaac Scott Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?