Citibank, N.A. v. CMT Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Defendant: CMT Properties, LLC, Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC and Ronald Sherman
Case Number: 2:2022cv02708
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
2 Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CMT Properties, LLC, Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC, Ronald Sherman. (Aloe, Paul)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Nicholas Saponara on behalf of CMT Properties, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Saponara, David)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Aloe on behalf of CMT Properties, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Aloe, Paul)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: CMT Properties, LLC answer due 7/8/2022; Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC answer due 7/8/2022; Ronald Sherman answer due 7/8/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/7/2022. (Minerva, Deanna)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or move until July 8, 2022 by CMT Properties, LLC, Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC, Ronald Sherman. (Rosenberg, Ronald)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 10:30 AM in before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the AT&T Teleconferencing Center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS RULES, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citibank, N.A.. Ronald Sherman served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Rosen, Philip)
May 16, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citibank, N.A.. Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. (Rosen, Philip)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citibank, N.A.. CMT Properties, LLC served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. (Rosen, Philip)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela K. Chen no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/12/2022. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3) (Landow, Concetta)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citibank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citibank, N.A.. (Rosen, Philip)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CMT Properties, LLC, Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC, Ronald Sherman filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15551214 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CMT Properties Summons, #3 Creative Mobile Technologies Summons, #4 Ronald Sherman Summons) (Rosen, Philip)
May 10, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
May 10, 2022 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citibank, N.A. v. CMT Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Philip S. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMT Properties, LLC
Represented By: Paul Aloe
Represented By: David Nicholas Saponara
Represented By: Ronald J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Ronald J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Sherman
Represented By: Ronald J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?