Lewis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Maurice Gerard Lewis
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02851
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,,,,, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Murphy, David)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference: On June 22, 2022, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (the "Bank") requested a pre-motion conference ("PMC Motion") seeking to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiff's "single count sounding in negligence" (hereafter, the "Dismissal Motion"). (PMC Motion at 2.) Plaintiff filed a Response in opposition asking that the Court deny the Bank's request to move for dismissal. (See Response, ECF No. #9 .) Having considered the parties' submissions, the Court finds it is not necessary to hold a pre-motion conference and, therefore, waives that requirement. Rather, it grants the PMC Motion to the extent that the following briefing schedule on the Bank's Dismissal Motion is set:(1) by no later than August 12, 2022, the Bank is to serve and file its Dismissal Motion;(2) by no later than September 16, 2022, Plaintiff is to serve and file his response; and,(3) by no later than September 30, 2022, the Bank is to serve and file its reply, if any.Once the Dismissal Motion is fully briefed, the Bank is to ensure courtesy copies of the fully-briefed Motion are promptly provided to Chambers. The Bank is directed to serve Plaintiff with a copy of this Order and file proof of said service forthwith. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/13/2022. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
July 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Murphy on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Murphy, David)
July 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan R. Buttner on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (notification declined or already on case) (Buttner, Ethan)
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Buttner, Ethan)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion Re: #8 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Maurice Gerard Lewis. (Valle, Christine)
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for pre motion conference by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Buttner, Ethan)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #7 : The time for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including June 22, 2022. Counsel for the defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the plaintiff upon receipt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/18/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Buttner, Ethan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 17, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Buttner, Ethan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Amy Bettino on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Bettino, Diane)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Buttner, Ethan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Supreme Court of New York, Nassau County, case number 605084/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15569870) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Ethan R. Buttner, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Buttner, Ethan) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
May 16, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. A completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - specifically page 2 of the document is incorrect; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Jakubowski, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Gerard Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Diane Amy Bettino
Represented By: Ethan R. Buttner
Represented By: David G. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?