Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. and Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Defendant: Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc. and KAF Properties Inc. doing business as VIA Media Group doing business as Long Island Web Guys
Case Number: 2:2022cv03393
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc.. (Farber, Braden)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/28/2022. (Patterson, Samuel)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc. served on 6/29/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. (Desouza, Daniel)
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint) (Farber, Braden)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to 7/29/2022. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/30/2022. (Patterson, Samuel)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. The parties are directed to call the AT&T Teleconferencing Center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 9, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KAF Properties Inc., Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15643363 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Desouza, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Desouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Desouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Lookout Clam Bar, Inc.
Represented By: Braden H. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAF Properties Inc. doing business as VIA Media Group doing business as Long Island Web Guys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?