Game Seven Everyday Inc. et al v. Conklin et al
Plaintiff: Game Seven Everyday Inc. doing business as Constantly Create Shop, Joseph Angerosa and Dennis Kinslow
Defendant: Joseph Conklin, Thomas Sharkey, Hunter Cole, Cory Amarosa and Daniel Amarosa
Case Number: 2:2022cv03394
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Hong, Loan)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Angerosa, Game Seven Everyday Inc., Dennis Kinslow (Vatrenko, Ievgeniia)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated as per plaintiff's Rule 41(a) notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/20/2022. (Cogan, Brian)
July 19, 2022 Minute Entry and Order for Premotion Conference held on 7/19/2022 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Counsel for both parties present via Zoom. Defendant's motion to dismiss is due by 7/26/2022; plaintiff's response 8/9/2022; defendant's reply 8/16/2022. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Victoria A. Torres Butler). (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Jane Daniels on behalf of Hunter Cole, Thomas Sharkey (notification declined or already on case) (Daniels, Katherine)
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for pre motion conference correcting work omission in paragraph on Count II of previously filed letter motion by Hunter Cole, Thomas Sharkey. (Daniels, Katherine)
July 15, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for pre motion conference on defendants anticipated motion to dismiss the amended complaint by Hunter Cole, Thomas Sharkey. (Daniels, Katherine)
July 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Jane Daniels on behalf of Hunter Cole, Thomas Sharkey (notification declined or already on case) (Daniels, Katherine)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A Premotion Conference on defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss will be held on 7/19/2022 at 3:15 pm by video. A ZoomGov link will be emailed to counsel of record. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kinslow, Game Seven Everyday Inc., Joseph Angerosa. Thomas Sharkey served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Vatrenko, Ievgeniia)
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Kinslow, Game Seven Everyday Inc., Joseph Angerosa. Hunter Cole served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Vatrenko, Ievgeniia)
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Cory Amarosa, Daniel Amarosa, Hunter Cole, Joseph Conklin, Dennis Kinslow, Thomas Sharkey. (Guzzi, Roseann)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 7/27/2022 at 1:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins, parties will be prompted to input the security code 3394#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/20/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis Kinslow, Game Seven Everyday Inc., Joseph Angerosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to Defendant Conklin, #2 Proposed Summons Rider) (Vatrenko, Ievgeniia)
June 17, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: As of 2/1/2022, Brenna B. Mahoney is the Clerk of Court for the Eastern District of New York. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. *Also please submit one summons with defendant listed and (see attached rider) with an attached Rider. (Guzzi, Roseann)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis Kinslow, Game Seven Everyday Inc., Joseph Angerosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Conklin, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Sharkey, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Cole, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant C. Amarosa, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant D. Amarosa) (Vatrenko, Ievgeniia)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15643529 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Dennis Kinslow, Game Seven Everyday Inc., Joseph Angerosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Rider) (Vatrenko, Ievgeniia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Game Seven Everyday Inc. et al v. Conklin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Game Seven Everyday Inc. doing business as Constantly Create Shop
Represented By: Ievgeniia Vatrenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Angerosa
Represented By: Ievgeniia Vatrenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kinslow
Represented By: Ievgeniia Vatrenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sharkey
Represented By: Katherine Jane Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Cole
Represented By: Katherine Jane Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Amarosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Amarosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?