Stern v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Stern
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv03679
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Celyn Whitt on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Whitt, Celyn)
August 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Daniel Taylor on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Taylor, Jacob)
August 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Timothy Williams on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Williams, Michael)
August 15, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael T. Williams, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15834914. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15843793 (Williams, Michael)
August 15, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Celyn D. Whitt, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15835032. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15843935 (Whitt, Celyn)
August 15, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Taylor, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15834980. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15843819 (Taylor, Jacob)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #13 : The Motion of Michael T. Williams for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/12/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #14 : The Motion of Jacob Taylor for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/12/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #15 : The Motion of Celyn D. Whitt for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/12/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Celyn D. Whitt, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15835032. by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Letter from Daniel M. Schwartz, Esq. to Hon. Arlene R. Lindsay, U.S.M.J.) (Schwartz, Daniel)
August 11, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Taylor, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15834980. by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from the State of Colorado, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from the State of South Carolina, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Letter from Daniel M. Schwartz, Esq. to Hon. Arlene R. Lindsay, U.S.M.J.) (Schwartz, Daniel)
August 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael T. Williams, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15834914. by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Letter from Daniel M. Schwartz, Esq. to Hon. Arlene R. Lindsay, U.S.M.J.) (Schwartz, Daniel)
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce H. Nagel on behalf of David Stern (notification declined or already on case) (Nagel, Bruce)
August 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Randee Matloff on behalf of David Stern (notification declined or already on case) (Matloff, Randee)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #10 : The Motion of Bruce H. Nagel for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/2/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #9 : The Motion of Randee M. Matloff for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/2/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce H. Nagel Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15801110. by David Stern. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Bruce Nagel to be appointed Pro Hac Vice) (Nagel, Bruce)
August 1, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randee M. Matloff Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15800967. by David Stern. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support with Certificate of Good Standing attached) (Matloff, Randee)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended until August 29, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/21/2022. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d) by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Schwartz, Daniel)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Schwartz on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Schwartz, Daniel)
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Stern. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. served on 7/7/2022, answer due 7/28/2022. (LoPiccolo, Joseph)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Landow, Concetta)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
June 22, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by DAVID STERN (LoPiccolo, Joseph)
June 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15680783 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by DAVID STERN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LoPiccolo, Joseph)
June 22, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stern v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stern
Represented By: John N. Poulos
Represented By: Joseph LoPiccolo
Represented By: Bruce H. Nagel
Represented By: Randee Matloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Celyn Whitt
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Daniel Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Michael Timothy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?