Aventura Technologies, Inc. v. Convergint Technologies LLC
Plaintiff: Aventura Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Convergint Technologies LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv04241
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER OF REMAND to Supreme Court, Nassau County, case number 606330/2022. Plaintiff is right; defendant's counsel still doesn't get this elementary principle of federal jurisdiction. A corporation has two citizenships -- the state of incorporation, and the state where it has its principal place of business. Since plaintiff is a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in New York, and the sole member of defendant LLC is a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in Illinois, there are Delaware citizens on both sides of this caption, and diversity is lacking. Under the prior version of the removal statute, defendants were required to post a $500 removal bond to secure the plaintiff's costs if the Court determined that removal was improper. Congress eliminated the bonding requirement in 1988 on the theory that Rule 11, as then amended, would suffice to award sanctions for improper removal. Five hundred dollars is a lot less now than it was in 1988. Nevertheless, because defense counsel did not have even an arguable basis for removing this case and lacked knowledge of the basic principles of diversity jurisdiction, defendant is directed to pay plaintiff the sum of $500 within seven days, and the Court retains sufficient jurisdiction to enforce this sanction if necessary. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2022. (Cogan, Brian)
August 19, 2022 Filing 12 Letter to Court regarding lack of jurisdiction based on amended notice of removal by Aventura Technologies, Inc. (Rosen, Gene)
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Convergint Technologies LLC (Amended Notice) from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, case number 606330/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint 5.12.22, #2 Exhibit B - Illinois Secretary of State Corporation Search, LLC Filed Detail Report, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Joanna Cornwell dated August 18, 2022, #4 Exhibit D - Delaware Department of State: Division of Corporations Entity Search, #5 Exhibit E - State of Delaware Annual Franchise Tax Report, dated February 21, 2022) (Freed, David)
August 12, 2022 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status and Premotion Conference held on 08/12/2022 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. The parties appeared by video. By 08/19/2022, defendant is to file an amended Notice of Removal adequately establishing subject matter jurisdiction. If defendant fails to do so, the Court will dismiss the case for want of jurisdiction. By that same date, plaintiff is to inform the Court whether it intends to consent to arbitration. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Linda Danlczyk). (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 10, 2022 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendant's Proposed Case Management Plan (Freed, David)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 Letter Filing Product Reseller Agreement by Convergint Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Product Reseller Agreement) (Freed, David)
August 9, 2022 Set/Reset Hearing: Premotion Conference set for 8/10/2022 is reset to 8/12/2022 and will be held in conjunction with the Initial Status Conference set at 1:00 pm. The parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the Initial Status Conference at #3 . A ZoomGov link for the conference will be emailed to counsel of record. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 . Defendant has represented that the document at issue "contains confidential and proprietary business information" and that "the vast majority of the information" is "irrelevant to the determination as to the arbitrability of this dispute." The Court finds that defendant's interest in maintaining its proprietary business material in a confidential manner outweighs the qualified public right of access. Accordingly, plaintiff is directed to file the document under seal. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/9/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Product Reseller Agreement by Convergint Technologies LLC. (Freed, David)
August 5, 2022 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference seeking leave to move to compel arbitration and dismiss the proceedings without prejudice by Convergint Technologies LLC. (Freed, David)
August 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Anthony Corsano on behalf of Convergint Technologies LLC (aty to be noticed) (Corsano, Nicholas)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A Premotion Conference on defendant's #7 letter motion is scheduled for 8/10/2022 at 6:30 pm by video. A ZoomGov link will be emailed to counsel of record. If plaintiff has any defense to the arbitrability of this dispute, it shall be fully prepared to discuss it at the conference. The parties shall file on the docket the full agreement by 8/9/2022. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/5/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 . Defendant can have until 8/12/2022 to answer or move because "in truth, the answer in a civil action is the most useless paper in the courthouse." Alexander By and Through Alexander v. Richardson-Merrell Inc., 541 F.Supp. 93, 94 (S.D.N.Y. 1982). For the same reason, the Initial Status Conference scheduled for 8/12/2022 shall go forward unless defendant comes up with a better reason for a short adjournment. This appears to be a simple goods sold and delivered case which should take little to no time to "investigate." Defendant chose to remove this case to federal court and it is going to move at federal court speed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/21/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy) Modified on 7/21/2022 (Weisberg, Peggy).
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or move to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Convergint Technologies LLC. (Freed, David)
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 20, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 8/12/2022 at 1:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 4241#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/19/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2022: #1 Additional Corrections) (Jakubowski, Laura).
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Convergint Technologies LLC from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, case number 606330/2022. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15763682) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit B - Illinois Secretary of State Corporate Search, LLC, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Joanna Cornwell 7.15.22) (Freed, David) Modified on 7/20/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aventura Technologies, Inc. v. Convergint Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aventura Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Gene W. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergint Technologies LLC
Represented By: David E. Freed
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Corsano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?