Larson et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Geraldine Larson and Joseph M. Larson
Defendant: Exactech, Inc. and Exactech US, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv06643
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Marcia M Henry
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 15 Letter and Proposed Direct Filing Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Lia M. Album, Judy Palmer, Mary Christina Ross, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Edward J. Smith, M. Christie Smith, Virginia Moraweck, Monica West, Walter West, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Richard Cozadd, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Robert J. Cullum, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Frank Hermann, Janice Hermann, Alan Hillie, Claudia Hillie, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
December 21, 2022 Filing 14 Letter To Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis and Honorable Marcia M. Henry by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
December 9, 2022 Filing 13 Letter in response to the Courts December 6, 2022 Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Mary Christina Ross, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Monica West, Walter West, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Ivan Hoyos, Joseph Centineo, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Paul Reyes, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Ellis Smith, Susan Stark, Barbara Taylor, Julian Taylor, James Teatom, Morris Tester, Sandra Tester, Gilda Thomas, James Vette, Edward Watson, George Wilson, Allan Bellone, Kevin McGuire Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
November 29, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CV - Kirk Pope, #2 Exhibit 2 - CV - Ellen Relkin, #3 Exhibit 3 - CV - Robert E. (Eric) Kennedy, #4 Exhibit 4 - CV - Carasusana B. Wall, #5 Exhibit 5 - CV - C. Calvin Warriner, #6 Exhibit 6 - CV - Rayna E. Kessler, #7 Exhibit 7 - CV - Joseph H. Saunders, #8 Exhibit 8 - CV - Mark P. Chalos, #9 Exhibit 9 - CV - Michael P. Cutler, #10 Exhibit 10 - CV - Maria Fleming, #11 Exhibit 11 - CV - Arati Furness, #12 Exhibit 12 - CV - Jason S. Goldstein, #13 Exhibit 13 - CV - David Harman, #14 Exhibit 14 - CV - Kristine K. Kraft, #15 Exhibit 15 - CV - Hadley E. Lundback, #16 Exhibit 16 - CV - Ben C. Martin, #17 Exhibit 17 - CV - Daniel A. Nigh, #18 Exhibit 18 - CV - Justin Presnal, #19 Exhibit 19 - CV - Patrick J. Wigle, #20 Exhibit 20 - CV - Cameron J. Falcon, #21 Exhibit 21 - CV - Kevin M. Fitzgerald, #22 Exhibit 22 - CV - Danielle Gold, #23 Exhibit 23 - CV - George E. Mclaughlin, #24 Exhibit 24 - CV - Courtney L. Mohammadi, #25 Exhibit 25 - CV - Joanna H. Oh, #26 Exhibit 26 - CV - Craig M. Silverman, #27 Exhibit 27 - CV - Ilana S. Wolk) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
November 23, 2022 Filing 11 Letter by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson. Exactech US, Inc. waiver sent on 11/7/2022, answer due 1/6/2023; Exactech, Inc. waiver sent on 11/7/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. (Silverman, Craig)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim M Schmid on behalf of Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc., Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc., Exactech US, Exactech, U.S., Inc., Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Schmid, Kim)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl A. Bjork on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Bjork, Sheryl)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J. Powell on behalf of Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Powell, Sean)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Kanute on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Bjork, Sheryl)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2) (CL)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (CL)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
November 2, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry (as related to 22-md-3044)for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/2/2022. (KD)
November 2, 2022 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16097153 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Silverman, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Larson
Represented By: Craig M. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Larson
Represented By: Craig M. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Bennett
Represented By: Sheryl A. Bjork
Represented By: Kim M Schmid
Represented By: Michael J. Kanute
Represented By: Sean J. Powell
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Represented By: Kim M Schmid
Represented By: Michael J. Kanute
Represented By: Sean J. Powell
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Sheryl A. Bjork
Represented By: James S. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?