Walker v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Trendell Walker
Defendant: United States of America, Breon Peace, James H. Knapp, Christopher C. Caffarone, Mark Lesko, Mark E. Misorek, Madeline M. O'Connor, Raul Mercado Jr, Douglas C. Palmer Jr., Randi L. Chavis, Terrence Buckley, Dawayne Cox, Judge Joanna Seybert, Richard P. Donoghue, Steven I. Locke, Joseph W. Ryan, Joseph Ferrante, Bridget M. Rohde, Robert Capers, Elizabeth Macedonio, Ilana Haramati, Joan M. Azrack and Joanna Seybert
Case Number: 2:2022cv07208
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Trendell Walker. Copy of Consolidation Order; returned to sender, not deliverable as addressed unable to forward. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-03864-AMD-ST, 2:22-cv-07208-AMD-ST (RG)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Rule 12 Notice to Pro se) (Leonardo, Diane)
December 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ESTOPPEL submitted by Trendell Walker, plaintiff pro se. (RG)
December 14, 2022 Filing 10 Letter to the Honorable Ann M. Donnelly to respectfully request a one week extension to the briefing schedule by United States of America Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-03864-AMD-ST, 2:22-cv-07208-AMD-ST (Leonardo, Diane)
December 8, 2022 Filing 8 Letter to the Honorable Ann M. Donnelly with regard to consolidating this case with Docket No. 22-3864 by United States of America (Leonardo, Diane)
December 8, 2022 Cases associated with 22cv3864. (RG)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER consolidating Walker v. United States of America, 22-cv-7208 and Walker v. United States of America, 22-cv-3864. A court may consolidate cases pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) where they "involve a common question of law or fact." A court has "broad discretion to consolidate actions under Rule 42(a)." Stone v. Agnico-Eagle Mines Ltd., 280 F.R.D. 142, 143 (S.D.N.Y. 2012) (citing Devlin v. Transp. Commc'ns Int'l Union, 175 F.3d 121, 130 (2d Cir. 1999)). "Consolidation is warranted where it promotes judicial economy and serves to eliminate... the danger of inconsistent verdicts." KGK Jewelry LLC v. ESDNetwork, Nos. 11-CV-9236, 12-CV-9130, 2014 WL 7333291, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 24, 2014) (internal quotation marks omitted); Johnson v. Celotex Corp., 899 F.2d 1281, 1284 (2d Cir. 1990) (considerations of judicial economy weigh in favor of consolidation). Mr. Walker filed two complaints in New York state court that have been removed to the Eastern District. Both complaints allege causes of action arising from the plaintiffs criminal prosecution in this Court under Docket No. CR-16-369 and include allegations about those criminal proceedings, including the issuance of a search warrant and his eventual guilty plea.Consolidation is appropriate under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) because the cases share common factual and legal questions. See Cullinan v. Cemtrex, Inc., 287 F. Supp. 3d 277, 283 (E.D.N.Y. 2018). Thus, the Court finds that consolidation serves the interest of judicial economy. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate Walker v. United States of America et al, 22-cv-07208 into the earlier filed case Walker v. United States of America et al, 22-cv-03864, close 22-cv-07208 and enter all future docket entries under 22-cv-03864. ( Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 12/8/2022 ) Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-03864-AMD-ST, 2:22-cv-07208-AMD-ST (RG)
December 6, 2022 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD Received re: Notice of Removal re: Supreme Court Case 615072/2022 from Suffolk County Clerk's Office. (SG)
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD Received. (RG)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re Order,, dated 12/1/2022 (Leonardo, Diane)
December 1, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to the Honorable Ann M. Donnelly to respectfully request that the Court set a briefing schedule for a motion to dismiss in this matter and in the related matter under Docket CV-22-3864 by United States of America (Leonardo, Diane)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER The Court acknowledges receipt of #5 the defendant's letter. The defendant is directed to inform the Court before December 8, 2022 whether it should consolidate cases 22-cv-3864 and 22-cv-7208 under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) because they involve common questions of law or fact. The defendant is directed to serve the pro se plaintiff with a copy of this electronic order and note service on the docket no later than December 6, 2022.Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 12/1/2022. (CG)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. Judge Gary R. Brown, Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/30/2022. (KD)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. 22-CV-3864-AMD-ST (CL)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
November 29, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 615072/2022. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leonardo, Diane) Modified on 11/29/2022 (CL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trendell Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Diane C. Leonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breon Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher C. Caffarone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Misorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeline M. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Mercado Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas C. Palmer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randi L. Chavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawayne Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joanna Seybert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P. Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven I. Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ferrante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget M. Rohde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Capers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Macedonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilana Haramati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan M. Azrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Seybert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?