Clarke et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Joseph Clarke and Juliet Parchment Clarke
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation doing business as Costco Wholesale
Case Number: 2:2022cv07220
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Hannon, Ian)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order January 10, 2023 initial conference adjourned to February 3, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/12/2022. (LV)
December 9, 2022 Filing 6 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference of January 10, 2023 by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Hannon, Ian)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for January 10, 2023 will instead be held at 10:00 a.m. on February 3, 2023. The completed discovery plan worksheet is to be submitted by January 30th, 2023. Counsel shall use the same dial-in information previously provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/9/2022. (RB)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on January 10, 2023 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by January 6th. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/8/2022. (LV)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph Clarke (Arida, Paul)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (LJ)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation from Supreme Court Suffolk County, case number 201008/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16176101) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hannon, Ian) Modified on 11/29/2022 (LJ).
November 29, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Clarke
Represented By: Paul N. Arida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Parchment Clarke
Represented By: Paul N. Arida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation doing business as Costco Wholesale
Represented By: Ian E. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?