A&D Gold & Silver Inc. et al v. The County of Suffolk
Plaintiff: A&D Gold & Silver Inc. and John G. Imbriano
Defendant: The County of Suffolk
Case Number: 2:2023cv00593
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by The County of Suffolk. (Napolitano, Donna)
February 15, 2023 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent of the Plaintiff by The County of Suffolk. (Napolitano, Donna)
February 15, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Napolitano on behalf of The County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Napolitano, Donna)
February 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of The County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Macy, Joseph)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/15/2023. (SP)
February 1, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A&D Gold & Silver Inc., John G. Imbriano. The County of Suffolk served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/20/2023. (Campanelli, Andrew)
January 27, 2023 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (AC)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The County of Suffolk. (AC)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (AC)
January 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by A&D Gold & Silver Inc., John G. Imbriano (Campanelli, Andrew)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The County of Suffolk filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16348248 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by A&D Gold & Silver Inc., John G. Imbriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Internet Web Page w Release Policy, #2 Exhibit B - DeMarco Quote, #3 Exhibit C - Suffolk County Code Chapter 563, #4 Exhibit D - DeMarco Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Seizure Requests, #6 Exhibit F - Records showing seizure made in response to request, #7 Exhibit G - Newsday Article, #8 Exhibit H - PD Records re Seizure of Engraved Items, #9 Exhibit I - Disposition Orders, #10 Exhibit J - SCPD Chain of Custody Reports indicating "Sold", #11 Exhibit K - Auction Lot Grouping Reports, #12 Exhibit L - Daily Voice Article re Oct 2022 Auction, #13 Exhibit M - Chain of Custody Reports re Covanta and Landfill, #14 Exhibit N - SCPD Incident Report 14-444229, #15 Exhibit O - Property Sheet 14-444229, #16 Exhibit P - Disposition Order 14-444229, #17 Exhibit Q - Chain of Custody Report 14-444229, #18 Exhibit R - Auction Lot Grouping Report, #19 Exhibit S - SCPD Auction Sales Receipt, #20 Exhibit T - Demand for Return of Property, #21 Exhibit U - Itemized List, #22 Exhibit V - Note History Report, #23 Exhibit W - SCPD Destroy Report, #24 Exhibit X - Demand for Return of Property, #25 Exhibit Y - Suffolk County Rules and Procedures_Chap 20. Sec. 3, #26 Civil Cover Sheet) (Campanelli, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A&D Gold & Silver Inc. et al v. The County of Suffolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&D Gold & Silver Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Campanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G. Imbriano
Represented By: Andrew J. Campanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Suffolk
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?