Garces v. CQ Auto Repair Shop, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gustavo Garces
Defendant: CQ Auto Repair Shop, Inc. and Carlos Quizhpe
Case Number: 2:2023cv01388
Filed: February 22, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo Garces. Carlos Quizhpe served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Klein, Nolan)
April 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo Garces. CQ Auto Repair Shop, Inc. served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Klein, Nolan)
February 23, 2023 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (AC)
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CQ Auto Repair Shop, Inc.. (AC)
February 23, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlos Quizhpe. (AC)
February 23, 2023 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (AC)
February 23, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC)
February 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CQ Auto Repair Shop, Inc., Carlos Quizhpe filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-16431086 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Gustavo Garces. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klein, Nolan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garces v. CQ Auto Repair Shop, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Garces
Represented By: Nolan Keith Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CQ Auto Repair Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Quizhpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?