Griffin v. The County of Suffolk et al
Plaintiff: Natasha Griffin
Defendant: The County Of Suffolk, Suffolk County Sheriff's Office and Jay Kaufman
Case Number: 2:2023cv05032
Filed: July 3, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The County of Suffolk. (Zwilling, Arlene)
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natasha Griffin. Suffolk County Sheriff's Office served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Smyth, Daniel)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh Harris Sutton on behalf of Natasha Griffin (aty to be noticed) (Sutton, Leigh)
July 11, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jay Kaufman, Suffolk County Sheriff's Office, The County of Suffolk. (JC)
July 10, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Natasha Griffin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons on Suffolk County Sheriff's Office, #2 Proposed Summons on Jay Kaufman) (Smyth, Daniel)
July 10, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
July 10, 2023 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
July 10, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No name and address on the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2023: #1 Additional Corrections) (CL).
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Natasha Griffin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Smyth, Daniel)
July 5, 2023 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit A COMPLETED SECOND PAGE(Not the Instruction Page). Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
July 3, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Natasha Griffin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Smyth, Daniel)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H Fitzgerald on behalf of Natasha Griffin (aty to be noticed) (Fitzgerald, Christopher)
July 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Kaufman, Suffolk County Sheriff's Office, The County Of Suffolk filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16853625 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Natasha Griffin. (Smyth, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. The County of Suffolk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Griffin
Represented By: Christopher H Fitzgerald
Represented By: Daniel Eamonn Smyth
Represented By: Leigh Harris Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County Of Suffolk
Represented By: Arlene S. Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?