Hartley v. Maria Regina Diocesan High School, and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania
Plaintiff: Michelle Hartley
Defendant: Maria Regina Diocesan High School, and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania, Maria Regina Diocesan High School and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania
Interested Party: The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York.
Case Number: 2:2023cv05376
Filed: July 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Maria Regina Diocesan High School, The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York.. (Stephens, Eric)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery All Parties.; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The stipulation staying the time to file a motion to amend, the time to file an answer, and, the time to commence discovery until after the motion to remand is decided is approved and hereby entered as an Order of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/2/2023. (LV)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Referring the parties joint motion #11 for an extension of time to amend, for an extension of time to file an answer and for an extension of time to complete discovery to MJ Tiscione to decide. All pre-trial matters, except dispositive motions, should be addressed to MJ Tiscione who will be handling all pre-trial matters in this litigation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/2/2023. (MI)
August 1, 2023 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Maria Regina Diocesan High School, The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York.. (Stephens, Eric)
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Maria Regina Diocesan High School, The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York.. (Stephens, Eric)
July 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16936797 by Maria Regina Diocesan High School, and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania. (O'Brien, Michael)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application #9 submitted by Michael J. O'Brien for Defendant Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/28/2023. (LV)
July 26, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michelle Hartley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of John Bonina, Esq., #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Verified Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 - Bankruptcy Court ruling dated June 1, 2023) (Bonina, John)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 7/25/2023. (GO)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks for all further proceedings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/24/2023. (GO)
July 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York. /NOTICE OF JOINT PETITION TO FIX VENUE FOR CLAIMS RELATED TO THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF ROCKVILLE CENTRE'S BANKRUPTCY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) AND 1334(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DRVC Related Parties' Petition, Memorandum of Law, and Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - The District Court Order) (Ball, Corinne)
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
July 18, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
July 17, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Maria Regina Diocesan High School, and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order Denying the Debtors Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Under Bankruptcy Code Sections 362 and 105(a), #2 Exhibit 2: Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cause of Action, brought by Defendant Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania, #3 Exhibit 3: Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Dismiss brought by Defendant Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania, #4 Exhibit 4: Affirmation in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss filed by attorneys for Plaintiff) (Stephens, Eric)
July 14, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maria Regina Diocesan High School, and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania from Nassau County Supreme Court ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16894810) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service) (Stephens, Eric) Modified on 7/18/2023 (CL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartley v. Maria Regina Diocesan High School, and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hartley
Represented By: John A. Bonina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Regina Diocesan High School, and Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Eric Peter Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Regina Diocesan High School
Represented By: Eric Peter Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congregation of the Sisters Servants of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, Scranton, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York.
Represented By: Eric Peter Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?