Adama Studios LLC et al v. Tang
Plaintiff: Adama Studios LLC and Terra Studio Ltd.
Defendant: Shunchao Tang and vertplanter.com
Case Number: 2:2023cv05842
Filed: August 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Shunchao Tang has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Shunchao Tang is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
September 20, 2023 Filing 12 Request for Certificate of Default by Adama Studios LLC, Terra Studio Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default) (Benschar, Tal)
September 20, 2023 REQUEST for Certificate of Default #11 is denied at this time. The affidavit in support of the request does not demonstrate, as is required by Local Civil Rule 55.1(b), that the pleading to which no response has been made was properly served. In addition, Local Civil Rule 55.1 also requires that the request contain a proposed Certificate of Default. (JT)
September 19, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Certificate of Default by Adama Studios LLC, Terra Studio Ltd. (Benschar, Tal)
August 28, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adama Studios LLC, Terra Studio Ltd.. Shunchao Tang served on 8/22/2023, answer due 9/12/2023. (Benschar, Tal)
August 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tal S. Benschar on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Benschar, Tal)
August 2, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Shunchao Tang. (LJ)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - '315 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - Trademark, #4 Exhibit C - Copyright, #5 Exhibit D - '315 Patent Infringement Chart, #6 Exhibit E - Copyright Infringement Chart) (LJ)
August 2, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent and Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - '315 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - Trademark, #4 Exhibit C - Copyright, #5 Exhibit D - '315 Patent Infringement Chart, #6 Exhibit E - Copyright Infringement Chart) (LJ)
August 2, 2023 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (LJ)
August 2, 2023 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
August 2, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
August 1, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Adama Studios LLC, Terra Studio Ltd. (Schwalb, Efrem)
August 1, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Adama Studios LLC, Terra Studio Ltd. (Schwalb, Efrem)
August 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shunchao Tang filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16950943 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Adama Studios LLC, Terra Studio Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '315 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Trademark, #3 Exhibit C - Copyright, #4 Exhibit D - '315 Patent Infringement Chart, #5 Exhibit E - Copyright Infringement Chart) (Schwalb, Efrem) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/2/2023 - original document was coming up blank) (LJ). Modified on 8/2/2023 (LJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adama Studios LLC et al v. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shunchao Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vertplanter.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adama Studios LLC
Represented By: Efrem Tobias Schwalb
Represented By: Tal S. Benschar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Studio Ltd.
Represented By: Efrem Tobias Schwalb
Represented By: Tal S. Benschar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?