Miller v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Miller
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc., Christopher M. Paradise, Patrick J. White, P. White Holding, LLC, Mike Todd and P. White Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv06140
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER. On 10/27/2023, the Clerk of Court entered a certificate of default as to Defendants P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, Mike Todd, and Patrick J. White. See DE #31 . The Court directs Plaintiff to file a motion for default judgment no later than 11/23/2023. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/2/2023. (JSB)
October 27, 2023 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, Mike Todd, and Patrick J. White have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, Mike Todd, and Patrick J. White are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
October 26, 2023 Filing 30 Request for Certificate of Default by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 26, 2023 Filing 29 Request for Certificate of Default by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 26, 2023 Filing 28 Request for Certificate of Default by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 26, 2023 Filing 27 Request for Certificate of Default by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 26, 2023 Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Austin Lloyd, Inc., has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Austin Lloyd, Inc., is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
October 26, 2023 Filing 25 Request for Certificate of Default by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
September 26, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Miller. Patrick J. White served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Miller. P. White Holdings, LLC served on 9/11/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Miller. Mike Todd served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Miller. Christopher M. Paradise served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Miller. Austin Lloyd, Inc. served on 9/11/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 18, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mike Todd. (LC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS ISSUED as to P. White Holding, LLC. (LC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrick J. White. (LC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher M. Paradise. (LC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Austin Lloyd, Inc.. (LC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in civil action 23cv6207(GRB)(ST) indicates this is a related case. (LJ)
August 16, 2023 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 16, 2023 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 16, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 16, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Jeffrey Miller (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 16, 2023 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
August 16, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
August 16, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
August 15, 2023 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
August 15, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Jeffrey Miller (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Jeffrey Miller (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Jeffrey Miller (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 15, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Jeffrey Miller (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 15, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Miller (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-16992876 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Jeffrey Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walsh, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Miller
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. White Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. White Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?