Miller et al v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allan R. Miller and Cheryl A. Miller
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc., Christopher M. Paradise, Brandon E. Chancey, Sean Klein, Patrick J. White, David Schmidt, P. White Holdings, LLC and Mike Todd
Case Number: 2:2023cv06207
Filed: August 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Filing 33 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Brandon E. Chancey, Sean Klein, P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt, Mike Todd, and Patrick J. White have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Brandon E. Chancey, Sean Klein, P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt, Mike Todd, and Patrick J. White are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
October 27, 2023 Filing 32 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 31 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 30 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 29 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 28 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 27 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 26 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Austin Lloyd, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Austin Lloyd, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
October 26, 2023 Filing 24 Request for Certificate of Default by Allan R. Miller, Cheryl A. Miller (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Attorney Affidavit in Support) (Baxter, Jason)
September 26, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. Sean Klein served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. Patrick J. White served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. P. White Holdings, LLC served on 9/11/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. Mike Todd served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. David Schmidt served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. Christopher M. Paradise served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. Brandon E. Chancey served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 26, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allan R. Miller. Austin Lloyd, Inc. served on 9/11/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further proceedings. Judge Gary R. Brown, Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/5/2023. (SR)
August 23, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Reissued as to Austin Lloyd, Inc., Brandon E. Chancey, Sean Klein, P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt, Mike Todd, Patrick J. White. (Original summons had incorrect spelling of deft. Sean Klein). (JC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (LJ)
August 18, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
August 18, 2023 Filing 12 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (LJ)
August 18, 2023 Filing 11 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
August 18, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Attachments: #1 rider) (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Allan R Miller (Walsh, Kenneth)
August 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17002130 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Allan R Miller. (Walsh, Kenneth) Modified on 8/18/2023 (LJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan R. Miller
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Miller
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon E. Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. White Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?