Gelman v. Northwell Health Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elena Gelman
Defendant: Northwell Health Inc. and Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00667
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: An initial status conference was held on 3/7/2024 before Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst in Courtroom 4E North. Counsel for the parties appeared in person and by Zoom. The Court set the following schedule: Leadership Selection: Applications to serve as Interim Class Counsel shall be submitted by 3/21/2024. Individual applications shall not exceed five pages and five pages of exhibits. Slate applications shall not exceed twenty pages and twenty pages of exhibits. Counsel for defendant Perry Johnson & Associates shall serve as Defendants' Liaison Counsel for all defendants except Cook County Health. Case Organizational Structure and Consolidated Complaints: Within 14 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a letter containing a joint or disputed organizational plan. The plan should address whether the case should be organized in "tracks" and whether there should be a single consolidated complaint or multiple consolidated complaints. The parties are encouraged to direct the Court to other cases that have used the organizational structure they are proposing. Within 45 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the plaintiffs shall file the consolidated complaint(s). Rule 12(b) Motions: Within 10 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for any Rule 12(b) motions. The letter shall replace the pre-motion conference letter that is usually required under Judge Kovner's rules. Cook County Health's requests for a pre-motion conference and to proceed on a separate briefing schedule for its anticipated Rule 12(b)(2) motion are denied for the reasons stated on the record. Discovery: Within 30 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a proposed protective order and ESI protocol. Within 30 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery schedule. In the event that the parties do not agree on such schedule or seek to stay discovery, the parties shall submit a joint letter to Magistrate Judge Dunst pursuant to his Individual Practice Rule IV.D.1. Status Reports and Conferences: The parties shall file a monthly joint status report. The first such report is due on 4/8/2024. The Court will hold a status conference every three months. The next status conference will be held via Zoom and telephone before Judge Kovner and Judge Dunst on 6/14/2024 at 9 AM. A Zoom link will be distributed to the parties in advance of the conference, and phone dial-in information will be made available on the docket. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/7/2024. (Court Reporter: Linda Danelczyk) (XW)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: At the initial conference to be held on 3/7/2024, the Court and parties shall discuss the topics outlined in the parties' 23 joint proposed agenda. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/6/2024. (XW)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Parties wishing to attend the Initial Status Conference on 3/7/2024 remotely may access the proceeding using the Zoom invitation link sent to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel are directed to forward the Zoom link to their respective clients. The parties shall join the video call (5) minutes before the conference.To access this conference telephonically, the public can call (888) 278-0296 and type in the access code 2012636. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, or rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/4/2024. (XW)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1: The parties are directed to review the attached Case Management Order, which outlines the Court's preliminary rules for the process of this case. An initial status conference will be held before Judge Kovner and Magistrate Judge Dunst on 3/7/2024 at 10 AM in a hybrid format. Parties may either appear in person in Courtroom 4E-N, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY 11201; or remotely by Zoom at a link the Court will share prior to the Conference. By 2/29/2024, the parties shall submit a joint proposed agenda listing items for discussion at the Conference. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 2/20/2024. (XW)
February 14, 2024 Filing 7 Letter to Judge Kovner in response to the January 12, 2024 letter filed by Israel David LLC by Crystal Brewster Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD et al. (Garber, Todd)
February 8, 2024 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AM)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner for all further proceedings. Judge Joan M. Azrack no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/7/2024. (CV)
February 6, 2024 Filing 6 Letter Re: Gelman Request for Reassignment to Kovner. by Northwell Health Inc. (Roberts, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elena Gelman. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 2/2/2024, answer due 4/2/2024. (Shamis, Andrew)
February 2, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elena Gelman. Northwell Health Inc. waiver sent on 2/1/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Shamis, Andrew)
February 1, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2) (CL)
February 1, 2024 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CL)
February 1, 2024 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
February 1, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northwell Health Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17516353, filed by Elena Gelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Shamis, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gelman v. Northwell Health Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Gelman
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwell Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?