Flagstar Financial & Leasing, LLC v. Seabreeze Medical, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Signature Financial, LLC and Flagstar Financial & Leasing, LLC
Defendant: Amy Barrow Brumfield, Mark Barrow, Sr. and Seabreeze Medical, P.A.
Case Number: 2:2024cv06959
Filed: October 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: An IN-PERSON Initial Conference is set for 1/15/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/7/2024. (Attachments: #1 AYS RULES) (JT)
October 4, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Affidavit of Service by Flagstar Financial & Leasing, LLC (Rappaport, Justin)
October 2, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
October 2, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (LJ)
October 2, 2024 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
October 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18344689 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Flagstar Financial & Leasing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rappaport, Justin) Modified on 10/2/2024 (LJ).
October 2, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flagstar Financial & Leasing, LLC v. Seabreeze Medical, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Barrow Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Barrow, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seabreeze Medical, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signature Financial, LLC
Represented By: Justin L. Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagstar Financial & Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Justin L. Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?