Kelly v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Samantha Maran Kelly
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2024cv08818
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff filed the Complaint on December 26, 2024, and the case was assigned to this Court on January 30, 2025. The parties are directed to adhere to the following procedure: Defendant shall promptly obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below and assert any affirmative defenses, and file these no later than April 30, 2025. This will constitute Defendant's answer. Plaintiff shall then file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings no later than May 30, 2025, or 30 days after Defendant has filed its answer, whichever is earlier. Defendant shall file and serve the response no later than June 30, 2025, or 30 days after Plaintiff has filed the motion, whichever is earlier. Plaintiff shall file and serve any reply no later than July 14, 2025, or 14 days after Defendant has filed its response, whichever is earlier. The parties are reminded that any assertions of fact in their legal memoranda must include citations to the administrative record. All briefs must comply with the page limitations set forth in this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury on 1/31/2025. (DJL)
January 30, 2025 NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (DF)
January 30, 2025 Case Reassigned to Judge Nusrat Jahan Choudhury. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
December 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N Hurd on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin (aty to be noticed) (Hurd, Christopher)
December 27, 2024 Filing 3 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (SMF)
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF)
December 27, 2024 Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case.No summons shall issue. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 12/27/2024, answer due 2/25/2025. (SMF)
December 27, 2024 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18614297 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Samantha Maran Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DeHaan, John) Modified on 12/27/2024 (SMF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Maran Kelly
Represented By: John W. DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Christopher N Hurd
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?