Rodriguez v. Suffolk County et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rodriguez
Defendant: Suffolk County, Suffolk County Police Department,, Suffolk County District Attorney's Office, Suffolk County Police Officer Michael Byrne, Suffolk County Police Sergeant John Flinchum, John Doe Suffolk County Police Officers 1-5, Jane Doe Suffolk County Police Officer 1-5, John Does 1-5 and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2025cv00367
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2025 Case reassigned to Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LF)
February 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: As detailed in the attached, if Plaintiff Benjamin Rodriguez does not serve the Defendants by April 17, 2025, or fails to show good cause why the Defendants have not been served, the Complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Rodriguez and to record such mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury on 2/23/2025. (DJL)
February 18, 2025 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Suffolk County, Suffolk County District Attorney's Office, Suffolk County Police Department,, Suffolk County Police Officer Michael Byrne, Suffolk County Police Sergeant John Flinchum. (LF)
February 4, 2025 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case:25-cv-531 The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (KS)
January 29, 2025 Filing 4 CIVIL FILING FEE: $405.00; Receipt Number: 200004752. (CV)
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. re #1 Complaint, A total fee of $405 (consisting of $350 civil action filing fee and a $55 administrative fee) [in cash, if submitted in person] or by certified check or money order made payable to the Clerk of Court, U.S.D.C.,E.D.N.Y., is required in order to commence a civil action other than an application for a writ of habeas corpus or a motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 - or - you may request to waive the $350 filing fee by completing an IFP application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Note: the $55 administrative fee does not apply where IFP is granted.) If you are a prisoner, you must also complete the Prisoner Authorization form along with the IFP application. An IFP application and/or Prisoner Authorization form is enclosed. (KS)
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (KS)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe Suffolk County Police Officer 1-5, Jane Does 1-5, John Doe Suffolk County Police Officers 1-5, John Does 1-5, Suffolk County, Suffolk County District Attorney's Office, Suffolk County Police Department,, Suffolk County Police Officer Michael Byrne, Suffolk County Police Sergeant John Flinchum Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Benjamin Rodriguez. (KS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2025: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Suffolk County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Police Department,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Police Officer Michael Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Police Sergeant John Flinchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Suffolk County Police Officers 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Suffolk County Police Officer 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?