Alessi v. King
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Alessi
Defendant: Michelle King
Case Number: 2:2025cv00679
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Natasha C Merle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2025 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT (Social Security Appeal) modified (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2, #2 Exhibit Part 3, #3 Exhibit Part 4, #4 Exhibit Part 5, #5 Exhibit Part 6, #6 Exhibit Part 7, #7 Exhibit Part 8, #8 Exhibit Part 9, #9 Exhibit Part 10, #10 Exhibit Part 11) (Fishel, Shannon)
April 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER -- The parties are directed to adhere to the following procedure: The Commissioner will obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below and will file the record by April 7, 2025. By May 7, 2025, counsel for the plaintiff must send a written settlement proposal to counsel for the Commissioner. By June 6, 2025, the parties must file a stipulation dismissing, remanding, or otherwise resolving the case, or a joint letter stating that they intend to proceed to briefing on their respective positions. If the parties are not able to resolve the case, the plaintiff will file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by July 7, 2025; the Commissioner will file and serve its response to the plaintiff's motion by August 6, 2025; the plaintiff will file and serve a reply, if any, by August 20, 2025. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 4/3/2025. (AG)
April 2, 2025 Case Reassigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle. Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (BBM)
April 2, 2025 NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (AGB)
February 7, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Fishel on behalf of Michelle King (aty to be noticed) (Fishel, Shannon)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge, they shall file a written consent form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge no later than March 10, 2025 pursuant to EDNY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2023-23 ("In cases exempt from Rule 16 scheduling orders - pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 - all parties must file a consent form no later than 30 days following the appearance of all defendants, except that in an action: a. Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the deadline will be 30 days following the notification to the Commissioner, as provided in Social Security Supplemental Rule 3"). Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/7/2025. (AGB)
February 6, 2025 Filing 3 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (LJ)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle King filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18740360 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Jacqueline Alessi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DeHaan, John) Modified on 2/6/2025 (LJ).
February 6, 2025 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
February 6, 2025 Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case.No summons shall issue. Michelle King served on 2/6/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (LJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alessi v. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Alessi
Represented By: John W. DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle King
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Shannon Fishel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?