National Satellite Sports, Inc. v. The Lonstein Law Office, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: National Satellite Sports, Inc.
Defendant: The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein and Julie Lonstein
Case Number: 1:2008cv00194
Filed: February 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Ulster
Presiding Judge: David R. Homer
Referring Judge: Neal P McCurn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to #16 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge Neal P. McCurn on 4/8/08. (lmw)
April 8, 2008 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal by The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein, Julie Lonstein submitted to Judge Neal M. McCurn. (Ferrara, Paul)
March 17, 2008 Filing 15 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein, Julie Lonstein re #14 Answer to Complaint (Ferrara, Paul) Modified on 3/18/2008 to reflect corrected case number on document (lmw).
March 17, 2008 Filing 14 CORRECTED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein, Julie Lonstein.(Ferrara, Paul) Modified on 3/18/2008 to correct case number on answer (lmw).
March 17, 2008 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein, Julie Lonstein re #12 Answer to Complaint (Ferrara, Paul)
March 17, 2008 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein, Julie Lonstein.(Ferrara, Paul)
March 10, 2008 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint served on Lonstein Law Office, Julie Lonstein, Wayne Lonstein on 2/28/2008, filed by National Satellite Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, James)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Letter Request. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer on 3/4/08. (ban)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marcus W. Corwin, Esq. for National Satellite Sports, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer on 2/29/08. (ban)
February 28, 2008 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed by National Satellite Sports, Inc. Verified Petition of Marcus W. Corwin, Esq. added as required by Local Rule 83.1. (wbl, )
February 28, 2008 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Wayne D. Lonstein, Esq. for Wayne Lonstein requesting No ruling on pending Pro Hac Admission for Marcus W. Corwin until defendants have opportunity to object to same submitted to Judge Hon. Neal P. McCurn. (Lonstein, Wayne)
February 26, 2008 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by National Satellite Sports, Inc.. Amendment to #6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marcus W. Corwin Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $30, receipt number 02060000000000956711. amended sponsor affidavit. (Reilly, James)
February 25, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marcus W. Corwin Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $30, receipt number 02060000000000956711. by National Satellite Sports, Inc.. Motions referred to David R. Homer. (Reilly, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2008: #1 Verified Petition of Marcus W. Corwin) (wbl, ).
February 21, 2008 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2008 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge David R. Homer. Civil Case Management Plan due by 6/16/2008. (lmw)
February 21, 2008 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Julie Lonstein. (lmw)
February 21, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wayne Lonstein. (lmw)
February 21, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Lonstein Law Office, P.C. (lmw)
February 21, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0954493)filed by National Satellite Sports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Satellite Sports, Inc. v. The Lonstein Law Office, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Satellite Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Marcus W. Corwin
Represented By: James M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lonstein Law Office, P.C.
Represented By: Paul G. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Lonstein
Represented By: Paul G. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lonstein
Represented By: Paul G. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?