Empire State Ethanol and Energy, LLC v. BBI International et al

Plaintiff: Empire State Ethanol and Energy, LLC
Defendant: BBI International, Jeff Kistner, Ed Stahl, Mark Yancey, Albany Renewable Energy, LLC and Bio-Pro Resources, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv00623
Filed: June 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: Albany
Referring Judge: David R. Homer
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER. ORDERED that BBI and Mike Bryan's 90 motion to confirm the arbitration award is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that BBI and Bryan's 90 motion to be dismissed from this action is DENIED with leave to r enew upon satisfaction of the arbitration award; and it is further ORDERED that Jeff Kistner's 91 motion for summary judgment is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the stay is LIFTED; and it is further ORDERED that Empire's 71 motio n for leave to file a second amended complaint is TERMINATED and Empire may refile its motion to amend; and it is further ORDERED that this matter is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gar y L. Sharpe on 1/25/2011. (Motions terminated: 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeff Kistner, 71 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Empire State Ethanol and Energy, LLC, 90 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by BBI International, Mike Bryan.) (dpk)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER, that the non-arbitrating defendants' motions for a discretionary stay (Dkt. Nos. 53,56) are granted. The the Clerk of the Court stay this action pending further order of the court. Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/25/2009. (jel, )
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 36 Motion for civil gag order ; ORDER granting 25 BBI, Bryan, and Yancey's Motion to Compel arbitration. The action is stayed as against these defendants under 9 U.S.C. Section 3 in lieu of dismissal; ORDER denying ARE, Bio-Pro, Kistner, and Stahl's 26 & 28 Motion to Compel arbitration and dismiss, Denied with leave to make a renewed motion for a discretionary stay. Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/20/09. (ban)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empire State Ethanol and Energy, LLC v. BBI International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire State Ethanol and Energy, LLC
Represented By: William A. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBI International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Renewable Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio-Pro Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?