Veeder et al v. Nutting et al
Plaintiff: |
Donna Veeder, Stacy Veeder and Brendan Veeder |
Defendant: |
Steven Nutting, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5 and John Doe #6 |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00665 |
Filed: |
June 8, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Albany Office |
County: |
Albany |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary L. Sharpe |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2014 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 71 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 72 Motion to Alter Judgment: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants' motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 71) is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plainti ffs' motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, for the entry ofjudgment and certification pursuant to Rule 54(b) (Dkt. No. 72) is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/26/2014. (ban)
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment: ORDERS that Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the C ourt further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants Martin, Strack and McDonald are DISMISSED from this action; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/29/13. (ban)
|
April 24, 2012 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Reconsideration/Motion to Amend. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs 9; motion to amend their complaint is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file and serve their amended complaint within TWENTY (20) DAYS of the date of this Memorandum-Decision and Order; and the Court further ORDERS that the dispositive motion deadline shall be extended until June 10, 2012; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/24/12. (ban)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' clai ms against the New York State Defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants Burns, Strack, McDonald, Gilliam, Valoze, Hard and John Doe1 are DISMISSED for lack of personal involveme nt; and the Court further ORDERS that all additional pretrial matters are referred to Magistrate Judge Homer; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/2/12. (ban)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?