Pflaum v. Town of Stuyvesant et al

Plaintiff: William Pflaum
Defendant: Town of Stuyvesant and Valerie Bertram
Case Number: 1:2011cv00335
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
Referring Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order 80 DECISION AND ORDER granting # 59 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/2/16. (lmw)(Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order 26 DECISION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's # 20 motion to amend and supplement his Complaint. Plaintiff's motion to amend and supplement the complaint is DENIED, except that his motion to amend the caption of the Com plaint to reflect the plaintiff is "William Pflaum" is GRANTED; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' # 21 cross-motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's surviving equal protection claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. The sole cla im remaining for resolution in this action is Plaintiff's First Amendment claim, in accordance with this Court's previous # 17 Decision and Order. This case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece for a Rule 16 conference a nd the issuance of a pretrial scheduling order. The Clerk of the Court shall amend the caption of the Complaint in accordance with this Decision and Order to reflect that the plaintiff is "William Pflaum." Signed by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/27/14. (lmw)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order 17 DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 10 . Plaintiff is granted permission to file a formal motion to amend his complaint within thirty days of the filing of this Decision and Order. Plaintiff has until thirty days from the filing of this Decision and Order to file proof of service of his summons and complaint. The case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Treece for a Rule 16 conference. Signed by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/28/2013. (lah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pflaum v. Town of Stuyvesant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pflaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Stuyvesant
Represented By: Thomas J. Mortati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Bertram
Represented By: Thomas J. Mortati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?