Beede et al v. Stiefel Laboratories, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Clifford P. Beede, Sherry E. Halligan, Eileen Mottl and Catherine G. Weeks
Defendant: Stiefel Laboratories, Inc., Charles W. Stiefel, Brent D. Stiefel, Todd Stiefel, Stephen Karasick, Michael Cornelius and Matt S. Pattullo
Case Number: 1:2013cv00120
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Mae A. D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 29:1104 Recovery of Benefits to Employee
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion in Limine. After carefully reviewing the entire record in this mat ter, the parties' submissions and the applicable law, and for the above-stated reasons, the Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 81) is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion in limine (Dkt. No. 86) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion in limine (Dkt. No. 89) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/7/2016 (bto)
September 30, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED (Dkt. No. 65); and the Court fu rther ORDERS that Defendants' First and Second Counterclaims, as well as their First and Eighth Affirmative Defenses are DISMISSED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED (Dkt. No. 67); and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/30/2015. (ban)
March 6, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that 30 Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that 30 Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/6/14. (ban)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beede et al v. Stiefel Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford P. Beede
Represented By: Paul M. Freeman
Represented By: Lela M. Gray
Represented By: Matthew J. Griesemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry E. Halligan
Represented By: Paul M. Freeman
Represented By: Lela M. Gray
Represented By: Matthew J. Griesemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Mottl
Represented By: Paul M. Freeman
Represented By: Lela M. Gray
Represented By: Matthew J. Griesemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine G. Weeks
Represented By: Paul M. Freeman
Represented By: Lela M. Gray
Represented By: Matthew J. Griesemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stiefel Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Stiefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent D. Stiefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Stiefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Karasick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt S. Pattullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?