Chen & Ju Inc. v. Zhang et al

Appellee: Gui Yong Zhang, Xue Hui Zhang and Yue Hua Chen
Appellant: Chen & Ju Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01007
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-1005 MAD and 1:18-cv-1007 MAD: The Court hereby ORDERS that pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Civil Nos. 18-cv-1007 and 18-cv-1005 are hereby consolidated; and the Court further ORDERS that pending a future order dismissing one of these actions, Civil No. 1:18-cv-1005 shall be designated as the Lead Case, and Civil No. 1:18-cv-1007 shall be designated as theMember Case; and the Court further ORDERS that all further docketing shall take place in the Lead Case 1:18-cv-1005-MAD; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Order on all parties inaccordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/5/2018. (ban)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Upon further review of this case, the Court finds that this case is related to the earlier case of Zhang vs. Ichiban Group, LLC, et al. (Case No. 1:17-cv-148), and therefore, in accordance with the Court's related case policy (See General Order 12) and in the interest of judicial economy, the Court sua sponte directs the Clerk to reassign this case to U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/28/18. (lmw)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appeal filed with the Bankruptcy Court on 8/16/18 by Chen & Ju Inc. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-11150. (usbcns, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby for all further proceedings, as it is related to 1:18-cv-1005 (GTS). U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/22/2018. (see) Modified on 8/27/2018 to correct case number to CV (lmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen & Ju Inc. v. Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gui Yong Zhang
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Xue Hui Zhang
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Yue Hua Chen
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chen & Ju Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?