Clark v. James & Sons Tobacconists

Plaintiff: Dennis Clark
Defendant: James & Sons Tobacconists
Case Number: 1:2018cv01035
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
1 Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by James & Sons Tobacconists. (Flint, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James & Sons Tobacconists.(Flint, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (Sent to the Register of Copyrights via regular mail.) (meb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/23/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James & Sons Tobacconists. (meb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against James & Sons Tobacconists (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4493095) filed by Dennis Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. James & Sons Tobacconists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Clark
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James & Sons Tobacconists
Represented By: Christopher P. Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?