Praileau v. The United States et al
Plaintiff: William Praileau
Defendant: United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, City of New York, Amy Burock, NYS Unified Court System, Polly Hoye, Karen Drago and The United States
Case Number: 1:2018cv01196
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to William Praileau Address sent to 1108 Barrett Street, Schenectady, NY 12305. (jdp, )
November 28, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #8 to change text to reflect Objection to R&R. (jdp, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 SECOND OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations filed by William Praileau. (jdp, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Objection to #6 Report and Recommendation filed by William Praileau. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdp, ) Modified on 11/28/2018 (jdp, ).
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of zip code exempt filed by William Praileau (jdp, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: Recommended that Pltf's #1 Complaint be dismissed with prejudice as to Defts The United States, United States District Court, Northern District of New York, New York State Unified Court System, Hoye, Drago, and Burock. Recommended that Pltf's #1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice as to Deft City of New York. Ordered that Clerk of the Court serve this R&R Order by certified mail, return receipt upon Pltf. ( Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2018, Case Review Deadline 11/27/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/6/2018. (Copy served via regular and certified)(jdp, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/6/2018. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(jdp, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (jlb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. (jlb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Praileau. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jlb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amy Burock, City of New York, Karen Drago, Polly Hoye, NYS Unified Court System, The United States, United States District Court for the Northern District of New York filed by William Praileau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praileau v. The United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court for the Northern District of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Burock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYS Unified Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Drago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Praileau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?