Beverly v. County of Rensselaer et al
Plaintiff: Albert Beverly
Defendant: Deputy J.W. Manzer, Hon. Joel Abelove, Sarah E. Romano, Sheriff Patrick Russo, Melissa Benson, Marc Pallozzi, Sergeant J.E. Panichi, Hon. Jill Kehn, Rensselaer County Sheriff's Department, County of Rensselaer, 6 Unknown City of Watervliet Police Officer's and Hon. Debra Young
Case Number: 1:2018cv01293
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations by Albert Beverly. (jdp, )
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: Recommended that Pltf's claims against Defts Kehn, Young, Abelove, Benson, and Pallozzi be dismissed with prejudice. Pltf's claims against Defts County of Rensselaer, Rensselaer County Sheriff's Department, Sheriff Patrick Russo, Sergeant J.E. Panichi, Deputy J.W. Manzer, Sarah E. Romano, and Six Unknown City of Watervliet Police Officers be dismissed without prejudice. Ordered that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Order upon the parties in this action. ( Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2018, Case Review Deadline 1/2/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/12/18. (Copy served via regular mail)(sfp, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/11/18. (Copy served via regular mail)(sfp, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket.. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/21/2018. (Copy served via regular mail)(jdp, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Albert Beverly. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jdp, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT received as to Albert Beverly re #2 Order. (sfp, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on November 6, 2018. (Copy served via regular and certified, along with blank forms)(jdp, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Albert Beverly. (Attachments: #1 Letter with Envelope)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverly v. County of Rensselaer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J.W. Manzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Joel Abelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah E. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Patrick Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Pallozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant J.E. Panichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Jill Kehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rensselaer County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Rensselaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Unknown City of Watervliet Police Officer's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Debra Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?