Homic et al v. Exphand, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Ranney, Charles Homic, Todd Dolphin and Daniel Tanguay
Defendant: Harold Protter, Sara Batterby, W. J. Kitchen, Chris Cookson, Timothy Cherotti, Exphand, Inc., Jim Wiatt, Weston Headley, Frank Nemirofsky and John Major
Case Number: 1:2018cv01353
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Timothy Cherotti, Exphand, Inc., Frank Nemirofsky by Daniel Tanguay, Charles Homic, Charles Ranney, Todd Dolphin. (Wagoner, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Filing Order served on Frank Nemirofsky on 11/30/2018, filed by Todd Dolphin, Charles Homic, Charles Ranney, Daniel Tanguay. (Wagoner, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Exphand, Inc. answer due 12/29/2018. (sfp, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Filing Order served on expHand, Inc. c/o Mark Theodore Schroeder on 12/08/2018, filed by Todd Dolphin, Charles Homic, Charles Ranney, Daniel Tanguay. (Wagoner, Matthew)
January 7, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Timothy Cherotti answer due 12/22/2018. (sfp, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Harold Protter on 12/04/2018, filed by Todd Dolphin, Charles Homic, Charles Ranney, Daniel Tanguay. (Wagoner, Matthew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Non-Service for Summons and Complaint served on Weston Headley on 12/03/2018, filed by Todd Dolphin, Charles Homic, Charles Ranney, Daniel Tanguay. (Wagoner, Matthew) Modified on 1/7/2019 to clarify docket text. (nmk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Timothy Cherotti on 12/01/2018, filed by Todd Dolphin, Charles Homic, Charles Ranney, Daniel Tanguay. (Wagoner, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER approving #6 Stipulation filed by Harold Protter. Deadline for defendant Protter to respond to the complaint is extended to 1/24/2019. Signed by U.S.Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/26/2018. (Baxter, Andrew)
December 26, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Harold Protter answer due 1/24/2019. (Baxter, Andrew)
December 22, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION to extend time to answer by Harold Protter submitted to Judge Baxter. (Kindlon, Lee)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Carey Kindlon on behalf of Harold Protter (Kindlon, Lee)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (sfp, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/7/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sara Batterby, Timothy Cherotti, Chris Cookson, Exphand, Inc., Weston Headley, W. J. Kitchen, John Major, Frank Nemirofsky, Harold Protter, Jim Wiatt. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(sfp, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sara Batterby, Timothy Cherotti, Chris Cookson, Exphand, Inc., Weston Headley, W. J. Kitchen, John Major, Frank Nemirofsky, Harold Protter, Jim Wiatt (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4568173) filed by Daniel Tanguay, Charles Homic, Charles Ranney, Todd Dolphin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Exhibit(s), #31 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homic et al v. Exphand, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Protter
Represented By: Lee Carey Kindlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Batterby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. J. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cookson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Cherotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exphand, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Wiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Nemirofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ranney
Represented By: Matthew D. Wagoner
Represented By: Matthew A. Toporowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Homic
Represented By: Matthew D. Wagoner
Represented By: Matthew A. Toporowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Dolphin
Represented By: Matthew D. Wagoner
Represented By: Matthew A. Toporowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Tanguay
Represented By: Matthew D. Wagoner
Represented By: Matthew A. Toporowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?