Dong et al v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Jing Xing Dong, Wen Ying Dong, Wen Ya Dong and Qiu Hui Zhu
Defendant: Gregory Richardson, Matthew Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2018cv01361
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Spina, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Spina, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jing Xing Dong, Qiu Hui Zhu, Wen Ya Dong, Wen Ying Dong. Kirstjen Nielsen served on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Gregory Richardson served on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Matthew Whitaker served on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Chien, David)
November 28, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY - the #2 summons was replaced with corrected summons to include a summons for US Attorney's Office. Copy email to Plaintiff's Attorney. (jdp, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jdp, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/28/2018) (jdp, ).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kirstjen Nielsen, Gregory Richardson, Matthew Whitaker (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4571357) filed by Jing Xing Dong, Qiu Hui Zhu, Wen Ya Dong, Wen Ying Dong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dong et al v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jing Xing Dong
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wen Ying Dong
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wen Ya Dong
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qiu Hui Zhu
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Richardson
Represented By: Thomas Spina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Thomas Spina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Thomas Spina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?