Friebely v. C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Friebely
Defendant: Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp. and C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01458
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp.. (Harter, Simon)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp..(Harter, Simon)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: On February 11, 2019, Defendant, Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp., filed a Letter Request seeking an extension of time to file an Answer in this matter. Dkt. No. #11 . Based upon the reasons set forth in Defendant's submission and upon the consent of the parties, the request is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an Answer on or before February 15, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/13/2019. (mab)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Request dated 2/8/2019 for an extension of time to answer while attorney Harter completes the admission process filed by Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp. Submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope)(meb)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: On January 28, 2019, Defendant, Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp., filed a Letter Request seeking an extension of time to file an Answer in this matter. Dkt. No. #9 . Based upon the reasons set forth in Defendant's submission and upon the consent of the parties, the request is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an Answer on or before February 8, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/30/2019. (mab)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Motion dated 1/28/2019 for an extension of time to answer while attorney Harter completes his admission filed by Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp. Submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (meb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp. by C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc..(McDermott, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc.. (McDermott, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Friebely. Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Hofmann, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Friebely. C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc. served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Hofmann, Paul)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. McDermott on behalf of C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc. (McDermott, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp.)(meb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc., Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4595295) filed by Joshua Friebely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friebely v. C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finger Lakes Industrial Contracting Corp.
Represented By: Simon Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D. Perry & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Friebely
Represented By: Paul T. Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?