Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01480
Filed: December 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 1/8/2019. (sal )
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (James, Jacqueline)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting plaintiff's #3 Letter Request for permission to file a motion seeking leave to file a third party subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and adjourn any scheduled Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference until the defendant is named and served. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 1/7/2019. (sal )
January 6, 2019 Filing 3 Letter Motion from Jacqueline M. James for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC requesting Leave to File a Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Adjourn Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference submitted to Judge Peebles . (James, Jacqueline)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding 33 Copyrights (List attached) {Copy of report mailed to the Copyright office by regular mail} (jmb)
December 22, 2018 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108.183.20.144 in the #1 Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly nameddefendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (jmb)
December 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT with Jury Demand: against John Doe (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4599838) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Listing 33 Alleged Copyright Infringements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?