UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Bianco
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Christopher Bianco
Case Number: 1:2018mc00017
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7604
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE as to Christopher Bianco by September 10, 2018. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/10/2018. (ptm)
August 10, 2018 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David N. Hurd in Utica, NY. Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2018. Judge Hurd hears statements as to #2 Return of Order to Show Cause/IRS Compliance, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and upon request of the Government agrees to a further order directing compliance by September 10, 2018. Respondent Christopher Bianco agrees to terms of proposed order. Judge Hurd signs order and has respondednt served with same in open Court. Appearances: Thomas Spina, Jr., Civil Chief, AUSA for Petitioner United States; Christopher Bianco, Respondent (Court Reporter Nancy Freddoso) (10:30am- 11:00am) (ptm)
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 285 Form) Executed as to Christopher Bianco served on 7/24/2018. Acknowledgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (dpk)
July 18, 2018 Set Deadlines as to Per the Order to Show Cause at Dkt No. #3 : Respondent Christopher Bianco appear before the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York at the Alexander Pirnie Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse at 10 Broad Street in Utica, New York, on the 10th day of August, 2018 at 10 a.m., #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2018 10:00 AM in Utica before Judge David N. Hurd) (ptm)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent Christopher Bianco appear before the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York at the Alexander Pirnie Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse at 10 Broad Street in Utica, New York, on the 10th day of August, 2018 at 10 a.m., The United States Marshal, or in the alternative, the District Director of the Internal Revenue Service or his authorized employee, shall serve a copy of this Order, together with the petition, exhibits, and other attachments, upon respondent on or before July 24, 2018, Respondent shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/17/2018. (jlb)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(khr)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thomas Spina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?