Dahlinger v. First American Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Susan Dahlinger
Defendant: First American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: January 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan Dahlinger. First American Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Pedro, Verne)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket and notes that a Notice of Appearance (Dkt. No. #5 ) has been filed as to the defendant. Plaintiff to file affidavit of service of process by 1/31/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/25/2019. (sg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Schapp on behalf of First American Specialty Insurance Company (Schapp, Jonathan)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First American Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corp. for First American Specialty Insurance Company.. (Schapp, Jonathan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to First American Specialty Insurance Company. (jmb)
January 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against First American Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4608832) filed by Susan Dahlinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahlinger v. First American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Dahlinger
Represented By: Verne Pedro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Schapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?