Deyo-Obler et al v. Johnson & Johnson
Plaintiff: Lori Deyo-Obler and G. Scott Obler
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00499
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Thomas P. Kurland for Johnson & Johnson requesting the Court adopt the SDNY's reasoning and stay all of the removed talc cases against J&J submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, April 30, 2019 Order (SDNY))(Kurland, Thomas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and supporting papers served on Attorneys for Plaintiffs on April 29, 2019, filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Kurland, Thomas)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiffs; Attorney Robert Gitelman, Esq.,. Phone number is 212-267-3700. Admissions due by 5/10/2019. [Copy of this notice was mailed to Attorney Gitelman via regular mail on 4/26/2019.](hmr)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/3/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Johnson & Johnson. (hmr)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 900456-18 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4723132) filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Responsive Pleading, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims (Del.) pt. 1, #4 Exhibit C - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims (Del.) pt. 2, #5 Exhibit C - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims (Del.) pt. 3, #6 Exhibit D - Electronic Docket, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deyo-Obler et al v. Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Deyo-Obler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Scott Obler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John D. Winter
Represented By: Thomas P. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?