Krongold et al v. iRelocation System et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Krongold and Samantha Krongold
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and iRelocation System
Case Number: 1:2019cv00658
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER - That any and all demands asserted by Plaintiffs for consequential damages, attorney's fees and costs of suit against Travelers are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. That Traveler's Motion to Dismiss (Document No. 9) is hereby withdrawn as moot. That Travelers shall file an Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date hereof. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/30/2019. (jel, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: re #12 Memorandum of Law. Plaintiffs' request for substituted service is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are granted leave to effectuate service of process on defendant iRelocation System by substituted service via certified mail on its relevant liability insurance companies. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/30/2019. (nmk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #7 Summons Issued Paul L. LASalle Enclosing Request for Substituted Service filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Lasalle, Paul)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold submitted to Judge Hurd attaching proposed consent order relative to motion. (Lasalle, Paul)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Lasalle on behalf of Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold (Lasalle, Paul)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Utica before Judge David N. Hurd Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit of Reid, #3 Exhibit(s) A to Affidavit of Reid) (Reid, Meg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.. (Reid, Meg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andriy Bondarenko, Registered Agent for iRelocation System. (meb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: granting #4 Letter Request. The clerk is directed to issue the proposed summons as to Andriy Bonarenko, as registered agent for defendant iRelocation System. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/17/2019. (nmk)
June 14, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company answer due 6/27/2019. (mgh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, CIS, Filing Order, Case Management Plan, Case Assignment and Consent Form served on Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 06/06/2019, filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Pedro, Verne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Request for issuance of summons as to registered agent for defendant iRelocation System, filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Paul L. LASalle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Affidavit)(Pedro, Verne) Modified on 6/14/2019 to clarify docket text. (nmk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/27/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to iRelocation System. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company)(meb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, iRelocation System (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4759077) filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krongold et al v. iRelocation System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Krongold
Represented By: Verne Pedro
Represented By: Paul Lasalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Krongold
Represented By: Verne Pedro
Represented By: Paul Lasalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iRelocation System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?