Bodhankar v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Nikhil Bodhankar
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00706
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services re #8 Notice of Appearance (Go, Samuel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Go, Samuel)
August 12, 2019 TEXT NOTICE to Attorney Samuel Go, re: #8 Notice of Appearance. Please electronically file proof of service of the above document on pro se plaintiff. (see)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Go on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Go, Samuel)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Samuel Go, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/9/2019. (tab)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel Go (Fee is waived) filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Weintraub, Jacob)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and General Order 25 served on US Attorney's Office, Attorney General, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and US Department of Homeland Security on 6/14/2019, filed by Nikhil Bodhankar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service on Attorney General, #3 Affidavit of Service on AUSA)(jdp )
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. (jdp )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/9/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) General Order 25 given to Pro Se Plaintiff at time the complaint was filed. (jdp, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Attorney Office, #2 Summons- Attorney General, #3 Summons- Immigration Homeland Security) Summons Issued given to Pro Se Plaintiff at time of filing of complaint.(jdp, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALB0011406) filed by Nikhil Bodhankar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3) (jdp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodhankar v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikhil Bodhankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Samuel Go
Represented By: Jacob M. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?