Witt et al v. Town of Wilton et al
Plaintiff: John Witt and Witt Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Steve Streicher, Town of Wilton, Town of Wilton Town Board, Arthur J. Johnson, John Lant, Duane Bogardus and John McEachron
Case Number: 1:2019cv00765
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Duane Bogardus, Arthur J. Johnson, John Lant, John McEachron, Steve Streicher, Town of Wilton, Town of Wilton Town Board.(Everhart, Leah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah A. Everhart on behalf of All Defendants (Everhart, Leah)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Request/Stipulation to extend answer deadlines: Duane Bogardus answer due 8/19/2019; Arthur J. Johnson answer due 8/19/2019; John Lant answer due 8/19/2019; John McEachron answer due 8/19/2019; Steve Streicher answer due 8/19/2019; Town of Wilton answer due 8/19/2019; Town of Wilton Town Board answer due 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/6/2019. (tab)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Letter Motion from John J. Henry for John Witt requesting extension of time for Defendants' to respond to complaint submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Henry, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Witt Construction, Inc.. (Wisniewski, James)
July 16, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Duane Bogardus answer due 8/5/2019; Arthur J. Johnson answer due 8/5/2019; John Lant answer due 8/5/2019; John McEachron answer due 8/5/2019; Steve Streicher answer due 8/5/2019; Town of Wilton answer due 8/5/2019; Town of Wilton Town Board answer due 8/5/2019. (khr )
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 (Follow-Up Service by Mail) served on A. Johnson, J. Lant, D. Bogardus, M. McEachron, and S. Streicher on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 served on Town Clerk, Town of Wilton for Steve Streicher, Town of Wilton Town Board on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 served on Town Clerk, Town of Wilton for John McEachron, Town of Wilton Town Board on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 served on Town Clerk, Town of Wilton for Duane Bogardus, Town of Wilton Town Board on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 served on Town Clerk, Town of Wilton for John Lant, Deputy Supervisor, Town of Wilton on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 served on Town Clerk for Arthur J. Johnson, Supervisor, Town of Wilton on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 served on Town Clerk, Town of Wilton Town Board on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, GO 25 served on Town Clerk, Town of Wilton on July 15, 2019, filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Rosborough, Robert)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/20/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Town of Wilton. (Attachments: #1 as to Town of Wilton Town Board, #2 as to Steve Streicher, #3 as to John McEachron, #4 as to John Lant, #5 as to Arthur Johnson, #6 as to Duane Bogardus)(khr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Duane Bogardus, Arthur J. Johnson, John Lant, John McEachron, Steve Streicher, Town of Wilton, Town of Wilton Town Board (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4783764) filed by John Witt, Witt Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 EXHIBIT D, #5 EXHIBIT E, #6 EXHIBIT F, #7 EXHIBIT G, #8 EXHIBIT H, #9 EXHIBIT I, #10 EXHIBIT J, #11 EXHIBIT K, #12 EXHIBIT L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witt et al v. Town of Wilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Streicher
Represented By: Leah A. Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Wilton
Represented By: Leah A. Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Wilton Town Board
Represented By: Leah A. Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Johnson
Represented By: Leah A. Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lant
Represented By: Leah A. Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Bogardus
Represented By: Leah A. Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McEachron
Represented By: Leah A. Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Witt
Represented By: John J. Henry
Represented By: James Wisniewski
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Witt Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Henry
Represented By: James Wisniewski
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?