Castro v. Partition Street Project, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Castro
Defendant: Gina Hornbeck, Thomas Struzzieri and Partition Street Project, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00768
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Letter Request from Defendant's Counsel for Gina Hornbeck, Partition Street Project, LLC, Thomas Struzzieri requesting extension of time to answer complaint: Gina Hornbeck answer due 9/7/2019; Partition Street Project, LLC answer due 9/7/2019; Thomas Struzzieri answer due 9/7/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/7/2019. (tab)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Defendant's Counsel for Gina Hornbeck, Partition Street Project, LLC, Thomas Struzzieri requesting extension of time to answer complaint submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . (Melley, Steven)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Castro. Thomas Struzzieri served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Wheeler, Russell)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Castro. Partition Street Project, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Wheeler, Russell)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Castro. Gina Hornbeck served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Wheeler, Russell)
July 1, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Clerk has corrected the receipt number in the docket text for the #1 Complaint. (meb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/19/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Partition Street Project, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Thomas Struzzieri, #2 Summons Issued as to Gina Hornbeck )(meb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Gina Hornbeck, Partition Street Project, LLC, Thomas Struzzieri (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4786890) filed by Lynn Castro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Partition Street Project, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Hornbeck
Represented By: Steven M. Melley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Struzzieri
Represented By: Steven M. Melley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partition Street Project, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Melley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Castro
Represented By: Russell G. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?